MA H271 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 440 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 440 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow regional school district school committees to designate one of its members to sign payroll warrants and accounts payable warrants. Education.
Title
Relative to regional schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 440 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-07-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S262 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H249 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2859 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2017
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H249 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2859 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H271.pdf |