MA H2709 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2617
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Accompanied H2617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Accompanied H2617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to sales and excise tax exemptions for disabled veterans. Revenue.
Title
Relative to sales and excise tax exemptions for disabled veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | House | Accompanied H2617 |
2013-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2617 (Replaced by) 2013-10-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2709 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2709.pdf |