MA H2703 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement group of Executive Office of Public Safety and Security dispatchers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Executive Office of Public Safety and Security dispatchers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1709 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2703 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2703.pdf |