MA H2697 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the small hydroelectric power net metering facilities program. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to small hydro
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4304 |
2017-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2695 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4303
H4304 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4304 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2697.pdf |