MA H2679 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of financial impacts on cities and town due to state regulation changes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to municipal impact statements
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2679 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2679.pdf |