MA H2674 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the retirement classification of forensic scientists employed at the Massachusetts State Police Crime Laboratory in the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to employees of the Commonwealth that are required to respond to crime scenes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-04-21JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3408 (Similar To) 2024-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1919 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2479
H2502 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4060 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback