MA H2660 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain law enforcement records as public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To provide for the public inspection of records made or received by special state police officers at educational institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4481 |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2673 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S844 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1702 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3356 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S844 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1702 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3356 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2660 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2660.pdf |