MA H265 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the safety of individuals with disabilities relying on life-support equipment. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To increase the safety of individuals with disabilities relying on life-support equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied S140 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S140 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1257 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S131 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1257 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S131 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H265 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H265.pdf |