MA H2649 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Garballey of Arlington, a petition of Sean Garballey that the Retirement Board submit a report on the use of partial payments to reduce the amount of time between a person’s retirement and date of first payment. Public Service.
Title
Relative to prompt retiree payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2800 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
H2671 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1731 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1730 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3968 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1715 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1716 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1681 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2748
H2671 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1731 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1730 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3968 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1715 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1716 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1681 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2748
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2649 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2649.pdf |