MA H2638 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove certain excise tax restrictions on cost and sale terms in retail cigarette sales. Revenue.
Title
Relative to recovering tax revenue lost to neighboring states
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H588 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H730 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H919 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2160 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3310 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H588 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H730 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H919 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2160 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3310 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2638 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2638.pdf |