MA H2636 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the maximum cost of clothing sales exempt from the sales and use tax. Revenue.
Title
Amending the sales and use tax exemption for clothing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2632 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2631 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2630 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2633 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2796 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2632 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2631 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2630 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2633 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2796 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2636 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2636.pdf |