MA H2634 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4639

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing a sales tax holiday in 2015. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sales tax holiday in 2015

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4639
2015-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2632 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2631 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2630 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2633 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2796 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback