MA H2634 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4263

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to roadway reopenings and safety

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to roadway re-openings and safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4263
2012-01-25JointHearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2011-01-24SenateSenate concurred
2011-01-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4263 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback