MA H2621 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits of certain employees of the Department of Children and Families. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement benefits of certain employees of the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4518 |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2508 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2444 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S1671 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1723 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
H2444 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S1671 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1723 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2621 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2621.pdf |