MA H2609 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the PRIM board. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the membership of the PRIM board
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Accompanied H2751 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1737 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2751
H2751 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2751 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2609 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2609.pdf |