MA H2606 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to tax credits for digital media products. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax credits, education and training for the design and development of video game and interactive digital media products
Sponsors
Rep. John Mahoney [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] |
Rep. Kate Campanale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2897 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H525 (Similar To) 2015-12-10 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H903 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H904 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H224 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2897 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H525 (Similar To) 2015-12-10 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H903 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H904 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H224 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2606 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2606.pdf |