MA H2592 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to marine vessel reporting and taxable exemptions. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the fairness of marine vessel reporting and fishermen exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3913
2017-03-23JointHearing scheduled for 04/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1634 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3913
H3913 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback