MA H2592 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3750

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3750
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to classification of employees of the State Ethics Commission. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to classification of employees of the State Ethics Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-14HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3750
2011-12-16JointHearing scheduled for 10/04/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2011-01-24SenateSenate concurred
2011-01-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H3750 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback