MA H2591 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a tax exemption for artisan products sold in cultural districts. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a tax exemption for artisan products sold in cultural districts
Sponsors
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/18/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1635 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1524 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4001
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3341 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H1492 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3907
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1635 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1524 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4001
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3341 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H1492 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3907
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2591 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2591.pdf |