MA H2582 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing retirement eligibility for members of the National Guard. Public Service.
Title
Relative to National Guard benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2016 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2363
S2015 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2031 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2032 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
H1947 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
S2236 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2611
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2015 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2031 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2032 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
H1947 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
S2236 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2611
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2582.pdf |