MA H2575 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Chan of Quincy, a petition of Tackey Chan legislation to clarity employee organization leave. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To clarity employee organization leave
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-03-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2575 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11020&generalCourtId=1 |