MA H255 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an online lottery. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to establishing an online lottery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H255 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H255.pdf |