MA H255 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing standards for restoring and maintaining stream flows, water levels and hydrologic regimes that protect natural aquatic life in rivers and streams. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to sustainable water resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4463 |
2011-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4463 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H255 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10143&generalCourtId=1 |