MA H253 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the Department of Children and Families to provide notice to counsel of changes in a child’s or a young adult’s placement and other events. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To provide notice to counsel of changes in a child’s or a young adult’s placement and other events
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H253 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H253.pdf |