MA H2510 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4472
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of businesses legally selling marijuana. Revenue.
Title
Rescinding the effect of IRC 280E on businesses legally selling marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4472 |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1723 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4472 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4472 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2510 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2510.pdf |