MA H2497 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4767

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a statewide gun offender registry. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a statewide gun offender registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4767
2017-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H4767 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback