MA H2486 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the cost of living adjustment for state and teacher retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the cost of living adjustment for state and teacher retirees
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2487 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2486 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2486.pdf |