MA H2485 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt sales of original art from the sales tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to growing the creative economy
Sponsors
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2485 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2485.pdf |