MA H2482 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to definitions under the emergency medical services system law. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to medical services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1586 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1491 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
S1611 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback