MA H2482 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4189
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to fully fund the collective bargaining agreement in the Sheriff's Department of Suffolk County. Public Service.
Title
Fully funding the collective bargaining agreement in the Suffolk County Sheriff Department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4189 |
2013-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4189 (Replaced by) 2014-11-20 - Reported, in part, by H3638
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2482 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2482.pdf |