MA H2474 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-13)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to benefits for county sheriffs' correction officers and jail officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To ensure pay parity for county sheriffs' correction officers and jail officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1587 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2721 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2554 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1660 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1689 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2721 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2554 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1660 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1689 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2474 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2474.pdf |