MA H2469 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce recidivism through evidence-based programs. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To reduce recidivism through evidence-based programs
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] |
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S450 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H798 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1853 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H798 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1853 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2469 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2469.pdf |