MA H2437 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to crime gun data reporting and analysis. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to crime gun data reporting and analysis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-11-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S992 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1562 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1562 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2437 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2437.pdf |