MA H2436 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Barrett of North Adams, a petition of John Barrett, III that the teachers' retirement system permit Rebecca J. Vanderstelt to purchase certain creditable service for teaching service in the United States Virgin Islands. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Rebecca J. Vanderstelt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4463 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2436.pdf |