MA H2402 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4624

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a training program for the treatment of certain opioid use and alcohol use disorders. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To expand access to medication-assisted treatment providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4624
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday March 20, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1021 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2394 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2390 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H719 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S35 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1840 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1137 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1210 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3047 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3048 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4624 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback