MA H24 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 21) as relates to unclaimed property and life insurance proceeds. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to unclaimed property and life insurance proceeds
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-04-15 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H24 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H24.pdf |