MA H2384 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the legal age for marijuana consumption and purchase from 21 to 25 years of age. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Increasing the legal age for marijuana consumption and purchase from 21 to 25
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3768 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2384 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2384.pdf |