MA H2379 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to policies and procedures for missing and abducted children. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts policy and procedures for missing and abducted children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1578 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2379 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2379.pdf |