MA H236 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4694

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish an industrial mill building revitalization task force (including members of the General Court) to stimulate the re-development, rehabilitation and revitalization of industrial mill buildings and surrounding areas in the Commonwealth. Community Development and Small Businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish to an industrial mill building task force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4694
2023-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses

Same As/Similar To

H783 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1184 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2757 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4694 (Replaced by) 2024-06-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback