MA H236 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Mirra of West Newbury, a petition of Leonard Mirra and others that the Division of Professional Licensure be directed to amend the Uniform State Plumbing Code and associated regulations to include a category of agricultural buildings and operations. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to updating the plumbing code in order to accommodate agricultural uses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H236 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H236.pdf |