MA H2355 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Wilmington be authorized to appoint of Adam J. Silva as a firefighter in the town of Wilmington, notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the certification and appointment of Adam J. Silva as a firefighter in the town of Wilmington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-05-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2355 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2355.pdf |