MA H2338 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing reasonable limitations on the solitary confinement of inmates 21 years of age or younger. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing reasonable limitations on the solitary confinement of inmates 21 years of age or younger
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3509 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S1286 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1335 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H825 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H822 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3498 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4357
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
H3509 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S1286 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1335 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H825 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H822 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3498 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4357
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2338 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2338.pdf |