MA H2334 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2432
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the employment of retired firefighters as training instructors by the Department of Fire Services. Public Service.
Title
Relative to fire fighter training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-07 | House | Accompanied by H2432 |
2015-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2432 (Replaces) 2015-10-07 - Accompanied H2334
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2334.pdf |