MA H2332 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 84-17)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to update penalties and protect electronic privacy. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect electronic privacy

Sponsors

Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Thomas McGee [D]
Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. John Lawn [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]Rep. James Cantwell [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Robert Koczera [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Kevin Kuros [R]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]Rep. Cory Atkins [D]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. James Dwyer [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Keiko Orrall [R]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R]
Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Sen. Linda Forry [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-06-05JointHearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1999 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S997 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S872 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1024 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H884 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H885 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2575 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback