MA H2310 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S916
Note: Replaces legislation H2309
Note: Replaces legislation H2309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to address workplace bullying, mobbing and harassment without regard to protected class status. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Addressing workplace bullying, mobbing and harassment, without regard to protected class status
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Story [D] | Sen. Katherine Clark [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Sen. Nick Collins [D] |
Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Rep. Alice Wolf [D] | Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-03-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-03-05 | House | Accompanied by S916 and H2309 |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2011 from 10:30 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2310 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12807&generalCourtId=1 |