MA H230 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow non-profits and charities to purchase alcohol from retail package stores for use at charitable events. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To allow non-profits to purchase alcohol from retail package stores for charitable events
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-06-16 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H230 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H230.pdf |