MA H2299 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4615
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the effects of military service on salary and vacation allowance for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to military leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4615 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-30 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4615 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2299 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2299.pdf |