MA H2273 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing the Massachusetts neighborhood preservation fund and the recording of residential mortgage assignments. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts neighborhood preservation fund through transparency of recording residential mortgage assignments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H166 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H166 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2273 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2273.pdf |