MA H2234 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an early college education program to increase postsecondary completion rates and participation in career pathways. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to early college high schools
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2276 |
2017-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S247 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
S705 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2276
S277 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2049 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4224
H2043 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H288 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H294 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2276 (Replaced by) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S705 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2276
S277 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2049 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4224
H2043 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H288 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H294 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2276 (Replaced by) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2234 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2234.pdf |