MA H2230 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to smoking in multi-unit residential buildings. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting youth from second hand smoke

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-27JointHearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2686 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Reprinted as amended, see S2694
S2694 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4598 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1852 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback